+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On February 28, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ filed
On February 28, 2007 in the House:
- House/ enacting clause struck
- House/ to Senate
On February 1, 2007 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On January 31, 2007 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On January 31, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House with amendments
- Senate/ pass 3rd
- Senate/ read 3rd
On January 30, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ pass 2nd
- Senate/ read 2nd
On January 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ comm report/ amended
On January 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 19, 2007 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to floor
On January 18, 2007 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On January 18, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On January 16, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from Legislative Research
On January 15, 2007 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (3)
January 31, 2007: Senate/ pass 3rd
- Yeas: 28
- Absent: 1
January 30, 2007: Senate/ pass 2nd
- Yeas: 24
- Absent: 5
January 19, 2007: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor