+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (38)
On March 10, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Lieutenant Governor
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
On March 9, 2006 in the House:
- Pass Review Forward for Enrolling
On March 8, 2006 in the House:
- Enroll Draft
On March 1, 2006 in the House:
- House/ read 3rd time
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On March 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ concurs with House amendments
On March 1, 2006 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker sent to Senate
On March 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President/ enrolled
- Received from Senate for Enrolling
On February 24, 2006 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ comm rpt fav/ amended/ placed on Consent
On February 23, 2006 in the House:
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
On February 21, 2006 in the House:
- House Comm - Not Considered
On February 16, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 14, 2006 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On February 14, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House with amendments
- Senate/ pass 3rd
- Senate/ read 3rd
On February 13, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ pass 2nd
- Senate/ read 2nd
On February 6, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ comm report/ amended
On February 3, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation
On February 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
On January 25, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from Legislative Research
On January 25, 2006 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
+ − Votes (6)
March 1, 2006: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 65
- Absent: 10
March 1, 2006: Senate/ concurs with House amendments
- Yeas: 23
- Absent: 6
February 23, 2006: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 10
- Absent: 5
February 14, 2006: Senate/ pass 3rd
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 3
February 13, 2006: Senate/ pass 2nd
- Yeas: 26
- Absent: 3
February 3, 2006: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor