+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (28)
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Lieutenant Governor
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Printing
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
- Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling
- Senate/ received from House
On January 31, 2014 in the House:
- House/ 2nd suspended
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate
- House/ to Senate
On January 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On January 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar
On January 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (2)
January 31, 2014: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 72
- Absent: 3
January 30, 2014: Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Yeas: 26
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor