+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On March 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ filed
- Senate/ strike enacting clause
On March 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules
On March 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Returned to Rules
On February 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed
On February 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 27, 2012 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 24, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
On February 23, 2012 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
On February 4, 2012 in the House:
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
On February 3, 2012 in the House:
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor