+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (40)
On March 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Governor
- Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
On March 8, 2011 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 7, 2011 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 4, 2011 in the House:
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate
- House/ to Senate
On March 4, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
On March 2, 2011 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar
- House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 25, 2011 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 3rd reading
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ to House
On February 24, 2011 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On February 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On February 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 11, 2011 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 11, 2011 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On February 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On February 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 9, 2011 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
On February 5, 2011 in the House:
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
On February 4, 2011 in the House:
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
+ − Votes (5)
March 4, 2011: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 49
- Nays: 16
- Absent: 10
March 2, 2011: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 10
February 24, 2011: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 24
- Absent: 5
February 23, 2011: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 20
- Absent: 9
February 15, 2011: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor