+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (36)
On March 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Lieutenant Governor
On March 18, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
On March 18, 2009 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 11, 2009 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 11, 2009 in the Senate:
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
On March 10, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President sent for enrolling
On March 10, 2009 in the House:
- House/ signed by Speaker sent to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
On March 8, 2009 in the House:
- House/ read 3rd time
On March 5, 2009 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time (Under Suspension)
- House/ Rules Committee to 3rd Reading Calendar
On March 4, 2009 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
- House/ received from Senate
On March 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ pass 3rd
- Senate/ read 3rd
On March 3, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ pass 2nd
- Senate/ read 2nd
On February 19, 2009 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On February 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 19, 2009 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to floor
On February 18, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd
- Senate/ comm report/ substitute
On February 17, 2009 in the House:
- Bill Substituted by Standing Committee
On February 17, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation
On February 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 11, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from Legislative Research
On February 10, 2009 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
On February 7, 2009 in the House:
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
On February 6, 2009 in the House:
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
+ − Amendment
House Amendment # 1
Failed
+ − Votes (4)
March 10, 2009: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 17
- Absent: 2
March 4, 2009: Senate/ pass 3rd
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 7
March 3, 2009: Senate/ pass 2nd
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 6
- Absent: 4
February 17, 2009: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor