+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (46)
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing
- Senate/ to Lieutenant Governor
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ circled
- House/ uncircled
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
- House/ received from Senate
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
- Senate/ concurs with House amendment
- Senate/ to House
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate
- House/ to Senate
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- House/ comm rpt/ amended
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ return to Rules due to fiscal impact
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 3rd reading
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ to House
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd reading
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
On February 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ committee report favorable
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On January 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (8)
March 8, 2016: Senate/ concurs with House amendment
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
March 8, 2016: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 72
- Absent: 3
March 8, 2016: House/ uncircled
March 8, 2016: House/ circled
February 29, 2016: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 14
February 22, 2016: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
February 18, 2016: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
February 2, 2016: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor