+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (21)
On March 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ filed
On March 12, 2009 in the House:
- House/ enacting clause struck
- House/ to Senate
On March 2, 2009 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On March 2, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ pass 3rd
- Senate/ read 3rd
On February 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ pass 2nd
- Senate/ read 2nd
On February 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On February 10, 2009 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 10, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 10, 2009 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to floor
On February 10, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 6, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 5, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
On February 5, 2009 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On February 5, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from Legislative Research
On February 5, 2009 in the House:
- LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis
On February 4, 2009 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (3)
March 2, 2009: Senate/ pass 3rd
- Yeas: 26
- Absent: 3
February 27, 2009: Senate/ pass 2nd
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
February 10, 2009: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor