+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 9, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Lieutenant Governor
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
On March 8, 2004 in the House:
- Pass Review Forward for Enrolling
On March 1, 2004 in the House:
- Enroll Draft
On March 1, 2004 in the Senate:
- Received from Senate for Enrolling
On February 27, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Senate/ pass 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Senate/ to House
On February 27, 2004 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
- House/ under suspension of the rules
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ read 3rd time
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ signed by Speaker sent to Senate
On February 27, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President/ enrolled
On February 26, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- Senate/ from Rules Committee to 2nd
- Senate/ under suspension of the rules
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
On February 25, 2004 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
+ − Votes (2)
February 27, 2004: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 71
- Absent: 4
February 27, 2004: Senate/ pass 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor