+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (37)
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Governor
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
- Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling
- Senate/ received from House
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ committee report favorable
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ 3rd reading
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd reading
- Senate/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 15, 2013 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- Senate Comm - Held
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Held
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publically Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (4)
March 6, 2013: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 64
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 7
March 4, 2013: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
February 28, 2013: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 26
- Absent: 3
February 22, 2013: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 3
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor