+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (39)
On March 22, 2010 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 10, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Governor
- Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing
On March 9, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
On March 9, 2010 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 8, 2010 in the House:
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate
- House/ to Senate
On March 8, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
On March 3, 2010 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar
On March 2, 2010 in the House:
- House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On March 1, 2010 in the House:
- House Comm - Not Considered
On February 24, 2010 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ to standing committee
On February 23, 2010 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On February 23, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ 3rd reading
On February 22, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On February 10, 2010 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On February 10, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
- Senate/ committee report favorable
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On February 9, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 8, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 5, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
On February 4, 2010 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (5)
March 8, 2010: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 72
- Absent: 3
March 2, 2010: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 6
February 23, 2010: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 26
- Absent: 3
February 22, 2010: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 25
- Absent: 4
February 9, 2010: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 6
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor