+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (36)
On March 5, 2012 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On February 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Senate/ to Governor
On February 22, 2012 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On February 21, 2012 in the House:
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate
- House/ to Senate
On February 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
On February 17, 2012 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar
- House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 14, 2012 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 13, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ 3rd reading
On February 13, 2012 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 13, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
On February 13, 2012 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On February 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd reading
- Senate/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar
On February 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 6, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 3, 2012 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
On February 2, 2012 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (3)
February 21, 2012: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 74
- Absent: 1
February 17, 2012: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 10
- Absent: 2
February 13, 2012: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 25
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor