+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On May 26, 2006 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On May 26, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Senate/ to Governor
On May 25, 2006 in the House:
- Pass Review Forward for Enrolling
- Enroll Draft
On May 25, 2006 in the Senate:
- Received from Senate for Enrolling
On May 24, 2006 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On May 24, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from Legislative Research
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/ placed on 2nd
- Senate/ read 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Senate/ pass 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Senate/ to House
On May 24, 2006 in the House:
- House/ under suspension of the rules
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ read 3rd time
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ signed by Speaker sent to Senate
On May 24, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President/ enrolled
On May 23, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
On May 22, 2006 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
+ − Votes (2)
May 24, 2006: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 66
- Absent: 9
May 24, 2006: Senate/ pass 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor