+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (49)
On March 26, 2010 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 19, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing
- Senate/ to Governor
On March 18, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
On March 18, 2010 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 16, 2010 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 11, 2010 in the House:
- House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate
On March 11, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ concurs with House amendment
On March 11, 2010 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On March 11, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
On March 11, 2010 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
On March 11, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
On March 10, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
- Senate/ received from House
On March 10, 2010 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
On March 9, 2010 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading/ suspension
- House/ lifted from Rules
On March 8, 2010 in the House:
- House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules
On February 24, 2010 in the House:
- House/ circled
- House/ 3rd reading
On February 22, 2010 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ amended
On February 19, 2010 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
On February 17, 2010 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received from Senate
On February 17, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ 3rd reading
On February 16, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On February 9, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ committee report favorable
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
On February 8, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 4, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On January 25, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 21, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On January 12, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
On January 12, 2010 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On January 12, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 7, 2010 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
House Amendment # 1
Prepared
+ − Votes (6)
March 11, 2010: Senate/ concurs with House amendment
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 8
March 10, 2010: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 47
- Nays: 19
- Absent: 9
February 19, 2010: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 2
February 17, 2010: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 5
- Absent: 1
February 16, 2010: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 3
February 8, 2010: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Sen. Adams, J. S.
Type:
Primary Sponsor