+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (39)
On March 8, 2010 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On February 26, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Governor
- Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing
On February 25, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
On February 24, 2010 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On February 23, 2010 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On February 23, 2010 in the Senate:
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
On February 22, 2010 in the House:
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On February 22, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling
On February 22, 2010 in the House:
- House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate
On February 17, 2010 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar
On February 16, 2010 in the House:
- House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 10, 2010 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 9, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ 3rd reading
On February 9, 2010 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On February 9, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
On February 9, 2010 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 8, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ floor amendment
On February 5, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On February 2, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ comm rpt/ amended
On February 1, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation
On January 28, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On January 27, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
On January 27, 2010 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On January 26, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 25, 2010 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
Senate Amendment # 1
Passed
+ − Votes (5)
February 22, 2010: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 73
- Absent: 2
February 16, 2010: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 1
February 9, 2010: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 4
February 8, 2010: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 2
February 1, 2010: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor