+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (36)
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Governor
- Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ committee report favorable
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ 3rd reading
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd reading
- Senate/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Not Considered
On January 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On January 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On January 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (4)
February 26, 2014: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 66
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 8
February 19, 2014: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
February 12, 2014: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 25
- Absent: 4
February 6, 2014: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 3
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor