+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (36)
On March 18, 2011 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Senate/ to Governor
- Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing
On March 10, 2011 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
- Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling
- Senate/ received from House
On March 9, 2011 in the House:
- House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ uncircled
- House/ circled
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ 2nd reading/ suspension
- House/ lifted from Rules
- House/ to Senate
On February 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ 3rd reading
On February 28, 2011 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On February 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
On February 28, 2011 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 25, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On February 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ committee report favorable
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 21, 2011 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
On February 17, 2011 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (4)
March 9, 2011: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 67
- Absent: 8
February 28, 2011: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 29
February 25, 2011: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 20
- Absent: 9
February 24, 2011: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor