+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (32)
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing
- Senate/ to Governor
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
On February 26, 2016 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ to House
On February 26, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate
- House/ to Senate
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on Time Certain Calendar
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate/ committee report favorable
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
+ − Votes (3)
February 26, 2016: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 66
- Absent: 9
February 26, 2016: Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Yeas: 26
- Absent: 3
February 19, 2016: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 3
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (29)
Type:
Primary Sponsor