+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 17, 2006 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 7, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Governor
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
On March 7, 2006 in the House:
- Pass Review Forward for Enrolling
On February 24, 2006 in the House:
- Enroll Draft
On February 23, 2006 in the Senate:
- Received from Senate for Enrolling
- Senate/ signed by President/ enrolled
- Senate/ received from House
On February 23, 2006 in the House:
- House/ signed by Speaker sent to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ read 3rd time
On February 20, 2006 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ comm rpt fav/ placed on Consent Cal
On February 17, 2006 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
On February 16, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 13, 2006 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
- House/ received from Senate
On February 13, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ pass 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Senate/ read 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
On February 6, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On February 3, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On January 21, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
On January 20, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from Legislative Research
On January 19, 2006 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
+ − Votes (4)
February 23, 2006: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 71
- Absent: 4
February 17, 2006: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 2
February 13, 2006: Senate/ pass 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
February 3, 2006: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor