+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (33)
On March 14, 2008 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 12, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Governor
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
On March 11, 2008 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On February 15, 2008 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On February 14, 2008 in the Senate:
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
- Senate/ signed by President sent for enrolling
On February 13, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On February 13, 2008 in the House:
- House/ signed by Speaker sent to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ read 3rd time
On February 8, 2008 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ comm rpt fav/ placed on Consent Cal
On February 7, 2008 in the House:
- House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 4, 2008 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 1, 2008 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On January 31, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House with amendments
- Senate/ pass 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Senate/ read 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
On January 24, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ comm report/ amended
On January 23, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation
On January 21, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from Legislative Research
On January 14, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
On January 14, 2008 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to floor
On January 11, 2008 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On January 2, 2008 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On December 26, 2007 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
On December 21, 2007 in the House:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
On November 28, 2007 in the House:
- LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis
+ − Amendment
Senate Amendment # 1
Committee Amendments Prepared
+ − Votes (4)
February 13, 2008: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 73
- Absent: 2
February 7, 2008: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 12
- Absent: 2
January 31, 2008: Senate/ pass 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Yeas: 29
January 23, 2008: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor