+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (35)
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing
- Senate/ to Governor
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate
- House/ to Senate
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- House/ committee report favorable
- House/ 2nd reading
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 3rd reading
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd reading
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
On January 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ committee report favorable
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
On January 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
+ − Votes (5)
February 22, 2017: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 60
- Nays: 12
- Absent: 3
February 17, 2017: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 1
February 14, 2017: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 29
February 13, 2017: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
January 25, 2017: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor