+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (41)
On February 26, 2010 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On February 18, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing
- Senate/ to Governor
On February 17, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
On February 17, 2010 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On February 11, 2010 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On February 11, 2010 in the Senate:
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
- Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling
- Senate/ received from House
On February 10, 2010 in the House:
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
On February 9, 2010 in the House:
- House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar
On February 3, 2010 in the House:
- House/ return to Rules due to fiscal impact
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ committee report favorable
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 2, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 1, 2010 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On February 1, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 1, 2010 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 30, 2010 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On January 29, 2010 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received from Senate
On January 29, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ 3rd reading
On January 28, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On January 28, 2010 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On January 27, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted
On January 26, 2010 in the House:
- Bill Substituted by Standing Committee
On January 26, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation
On January 25, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On January 23, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
On January 19, 2010 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (5)
February 10, 2010: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 69
- Absent: 6
February 3, 2010: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 11
- Absent: 4
January 29, 2010: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 22
- Absent: 7
January 28, 2010: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 28
- Absent: 1
January 26, 2010: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor