+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (60)
On March 15, 2012 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Senate/ to Governor
On March 13, 2012 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On February 23, 2012 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On February 22, 2012 in the Senate:
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
- Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling
- Senate/ received from House
On February 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed back on 3rd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ motion to reconsider
- Senate/ motion to reconsider passed
- Senate/ under suspension of the rules
- Senate/ to House
On February 21, 2012 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate
- House/ to Senate
On February 17, 2012 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate
- House/ received from Senate
On February 17, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ concurs with House amendment
On February 16, 2012 in the House:
- House/ floor amendment
- House/ circled
- House/ uncircled
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ passed 3rd reading
On February 16, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
On February 16, 2012 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
On February 16, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On February 15, 2012 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar
On February 9, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 3, 2012 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 1, 2012 in the House:
- House/ return to Rules due to fiscal impact
- House/ 1st & 2nd readings/ suspension
- House/ comm rpt/ substituted/ amended
On January 31, 2012 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On January 30, 2012 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 30, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 30, 2012 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 27, 2012 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On January 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ 3rd reading
On January 26, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On January 25, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On January 24, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 19, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
On December 20, 2011 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
House Amendment # 1
Passed
+ − Votes (7)
February 17, 2012: Senate/ concurs with House amendment
- Yeas: 28
- Absent: 1
February 16, 2012: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 65
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 9
February 16, 2012: House/ circled
February 16, 2012: House/ uncircled
January 31, 2012: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 10
- Absent: 5
January 27, 2012: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
January 26, 2012: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 24
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor