+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (32)
On March 17, 2005 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 9, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Governor
On March 8, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
On March 8, 2005 in the House:
- Pass Review Forward for Enrolling
On March 1, 2005 in the House:
- Enroll Draft
On February 28, 2005 in the Senate:
- Received from Senate for Enrolling
- Senate/ signed by President/ enrolled
- Senate/ received from House
On February 25, 2005 in the House:
- House/ signed by Speaker sent to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ read 3rd time
- House/ Rules Committee to 3rd Reading Calendar
On February 4, 2005 in the House:
- House/ return to Rules Comm due to fiscal impact
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ committee report favorable
On February 3, 2005 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 31, 2005 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 28, 2005 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On January 27, 2005 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On January 27, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ pass 3rd
- Senate/ read 3rd
On January 26, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate/ pass 2nd
- Senate/ read 2nd
On January 20, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On January 19, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 17, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
On January 12, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from Legislative Research
On December 20, 2004 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
+ − Votes (5)
February 25, 2005: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 65
- Absent: 10
February 3, 2005: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1
January 27, 2005: Senate/ pass 3rd
- Yeas: 24
- Absent: 5
January 26, 2005: Senate/ pass 2nd
- Yeas: 25
- Absent: 4
January 19, 2005: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor