+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (32)
On March 15, 2006 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 10, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
On March 10, 2006 in the House:
- Pass Review Forward for Enrolling
On March 10, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Governor
On February 10, 2006 in the House:
- Enroll Draft
On February 9, 2006 in the House:
- House/ signed by Speaker sent to Senate
- House/ read 3rd time
- House/ passed 3rd reading
On February 9, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President/ enrolled
- Received from Senate for Enrolling
On February 6, 2006 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ comm rpt fav/ placed on Consent Cal
On February 3, 2006 in the House:
- House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 31, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 27, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ pass 3rd
- Senate/ read 3rd
On January 27, 2006 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On January 27, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
On January 27, 2006 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On January 24, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 2nd
- Senate/ comm report/ placed on Consent Cal
On January 20, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate/ to standing committee
On January 16, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
On January 13, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from Legislative Research
On January 5, 2006 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
+ − Votes (4)
February 9, 2006: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 67
- Absent: 8
February 3, 2006: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 1
January 27, 2006: Senate/ pass 3rd
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
January 20, 2006: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor