+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ filed
- Senate/ strike enacting clause
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Returned to Rules
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Held
On February 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Held
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Vote
February 25, 2014: Senate Comm - Held
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor