+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (38)
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate/ filed
- Senate/ received from House
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ strike enacting clause
- House/ 2nd suspended
- House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ to House
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ motion to reconsider
- Senate/ filed
- Senate/ failed
- Senate/ floor amendment # 4
- Senate/ floor amendment # 5
- Senate/ 3rd reading
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted/ amended
- Senate/ 2nd reading
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 3
- Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2
- Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Not Considered
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Not Considered
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
- Senate Comm - Held
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Not Considered
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendments (5)
Senate Floor Amendment 5
Passed
Senate Floor Amendment 4
Passed
Senate Committee Amendment 2
Passed
Senate Committee Amendment 3
Passed
Senate Committee Amendment 1
Passed
+ − Votes (14)
March 5, 2018: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 15
- Nays: 13
- Absent: 1
March 5, 2018: Senate/ uncircled
February 28, 2018: Senate/ floor amendment
February 28, 2018: Senate/ failed
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 12
- Absent: 5
February 28, 2018: Senate/ circled
February 28, 2018: Senate/ floor amendment # 4
February 28, 2018: Senate/ floor amendment # 5
February 28, 2018: Senate/ motion to reconsider
February 27, 2018: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 15
- Nays: 12
- Absent: 2
February 26, 2018: Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 3
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 2
February 26, 2018: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
February 26, 2018: Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 2
February 26, 2018: Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 2
February 16, 2018: Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor