+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (52)
On March 23, 2010 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 18, 2010 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 18, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Governor
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing
On March 15, 2010 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 11, 2010 in the House:
- House/ circled
- House/ lifted from Rules
- House/ 2nd reading/ suspension
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate
- House/ to Senate
On March 11, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
On March 11, 2010 in the House:
- House/ passed 3rd reading
On February 26, 2010 in the House:
- House/ return to Rules due to fiscal impact
- House/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar
- House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 24, 2010 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 23, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ 3rd reading
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ to House
On February 23, 2010 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 22, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ floor amendment
- Senate/ uncircled
On February 9, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On February 8, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 5, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 5, 2010 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On February 4, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
On February 4, 2010 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 3, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On February 3, 2010 in the House:
- Bill Substituted by Standing Committee
On February 3, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation
On February 1, 2010 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On January 26, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Held
On January 25, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On January 21, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
On January 19, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 14, 2010 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendments (2)
Senate Amendment # 1
Passed
Senate Amendment # 2
Passed
+ − Votes (5)
March 11, 2010: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 72
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
February 26, 2010: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 2
February 23, 2010: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 23
- Absent: 6
February 22, 2010: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 25
- Absent: 4
February 3, 2010: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 6
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor