+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (40)
On March 18, 2008 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 14, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Governor
On March 12, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
On March 12, 2008 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 4, 2008 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 3, 2008 in the House:
- House/ signed by Speaker sent to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ read 3rd time
On March 3, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President sent for enrolling
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
On February 29, 2008 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time (Under Suspension)
- House/ lift bill from committee
On February 26, 2008 in the House:
- House/ return to Rules Comm due to fiscal impact
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ committee report favorable
On February 25, 2008 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 18, 2008 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 15, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 3rd
- Senate/ pass 2nd & 3rd
- Senate/ to House
On February 15, 2008 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On February 12, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 12, 2008 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to floor
On February 12, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 2nd
- Senate/ comm report/ placed on Consent Cal
On February 11, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 8, 2008 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 5, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from Legislative Research
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
On February 4, 2008 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
On February 1, 2008 in the House:
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
+ − Votes (4)
March 3, 2008: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 64
- Absent: 11
February 25, 2008: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 6
February 15, 2008: Senate/ pass 2nd & 3rd
- Yeas: 25
- Absent: 4
February 11, 2008: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor