+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (31)
On March 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate/ filed
- Senate/ received from House
On March 4, 2022 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ strike enacting clause
- House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules/ amended
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- House Comm - Returned to Rules
On February 7, 2022 in the House:
- House Comm - Held
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1
On February 2, 2022 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 3rd reading
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ to House
On February 1, 2022 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On January 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On January 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On January 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendments (2)
House Committee Amendment 1
Passed
House Committee Amendment 2
Passed
+ − Votes (5)
February 7, 2022: House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1
- Yeas: 10
- Absent: 2
February 7, 2022: House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2
- Yeas: 10
- Absent: 2
February 1, 2022: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 25
- Absent: 4
January 31, 2022: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
January 20, 2022: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor