+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate/ filed
- Senate/ strike enacting clause
On February 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 31, 2020 in the Senate:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On January 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor