+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (32)
On March 10, 2006 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 8, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
On March 8, 2006 in the House:
- Pass Review Forward for Enrolling
On March 8, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Governor
On March 1, 2006 in the House:
- Enroll Draft
On February 28, 2006 in the Senate:
- Received from Senate for Enrolling
- Senate/ signed by President/ enrolled
- Senate/ received from House
On February 28, 2006 in the House:
- House/ signed by Speaker sent to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ read 3rd time
- House/ read 2nd time (Under Suspension)
On February 21, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ pass 3rd
- Senate/ read 3rd
- Senate/ to House
On February 21, 2006 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On February 20, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ pass 2nd
- Senate/ read 2nd
On February 13, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 9, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd
- Senate/ comm report/ substitute
On February 8, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 8, 2006 in the House:
- Substitute Recommended by Standing Committee
On February 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from Legislative Research
On February 1, 2006 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
On January 31, 2006 in the House:
- Numbered
On January 28, 2006 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
On January 27, 2006 in the House:
- Numbered by Short Title
+ − Votes (4)
February 28, 2006: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 58
- Absent: 17
February 21, 2006: Senate/ pass 3rd
- Yeas: 25
- Absent: 4
February 20, 2006: Senate/ pass 2nd
- Yeas: 26
- Absent: 3
February 8, 2006: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 3
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor