+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (59)
On March 22, 2012 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 19, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Governor
- Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing
On March 16, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
On March 16, 2012 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 14, 2012 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 12, 2012 in the Senate:
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
On March 9, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling
On March 9, 2012 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate
- House/ received from Senate
On March 8, 2012 in the House:
- House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar
- House/ 2nd reading/ suspension
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ floor amendment
- House/ passed 3rd reading
On March 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
- Senate/ concurs with House amendment
- Senate/ to House
On March 8, 2012 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
On February 29, 2012 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received from Senate
On February 29, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ floor amendment
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ 3rd reading
On February 28, 2012 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On February 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
On February 27, 2012 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 24, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ substituted
- Senate/ placed back on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ motion to reconsider passed
- Senate/ motion to reconsider
On February 23, 2012 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On February 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ failed
- Senate/ uncircled
On February 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On February 16, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted/ amended
On February 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation
On February 13, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed
On February 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 9, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
On February 9, 2012 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
On February 4, 2012 in the House:
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
On February 3, 2012 in the House:
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
+ − Amendment
Senate Amendment # 1
Passed
+ − Votes (13)
March 8, 2012: House/ floor amendment
March 8, 2012: Senate/ concurs with House amendment
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 6
- Absent: 3
March 8, 2012: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 64
- Nays: 10
- Absent: 1
February 29, 2012: Senate/ uncircled
February 29, 2012: Senate/ circled
February 29, 2012: Senate/ floor amendment
February 29, 2012: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 10
February 28, 2012: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 12
February 24, 2012: Senate/ substituted
February 24, 2012: Senate/ motion to reconsider
February 23, 2012: Senate/ failed
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 18
- Absent: 5
February 14, 2012: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 2
February 13, 2012: Senate Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed
- Yeas: 2
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor