+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (31)
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ filed
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- House/ strike enacting clause
- House/ to Senate
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules
- House/ 2nd reading
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed
- House Comm - Returned to Rules
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- House Comm - Not Considered
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ to standing committee
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 3rd reading
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ to House
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd reading
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
On January 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ to standing committee
On January 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
+ − Votes (5)
March 6, 2017: House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 7
- Absent: 2
March 1, 2017: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 4
February 28, 2017: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 24
- Absent: 5
February 17, 2017: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 2
February 17, 2017: Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor