+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (28)
On March 11, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ filed
On March 11, 2010 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ strike enacting clause
On February 17, 2010 in the House:
- House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules
- House Comm - Returned to Rules
On February 8, 2010 in the House:
- House Comm - Held
On February 4, 2010 in the House:
- House Comm - Held
On February 1, 2010 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 29, 2010 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received from Senate
On January 29, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ 3rd reading
On January 28, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd reading
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
On January 27, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On January 26, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 25, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 21, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On January 13, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
On January 13, 2010 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On January 7, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 6, 2010 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (4)
February 17, 2010: House Comm - Returned to Rules
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 3
January 29, 2010: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 21
- Absent: 8
January 28, 2010: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
January 26, 2010: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor