+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (39)
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Governor
- Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar
- House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ uncircled
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ 3rd reading
On February 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ floor amendment # 2
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On January 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On January 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On January 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
Senate Floor Amendment 2
Passed
+ − Votes (9)
February 22, 2018: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 74
- Absent: 1
February 20, 2018: House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 5
February 20, 2018: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 5
February 13, 2018: Senate/ uncircled
February 13, 2018: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
February 12, 2018: Senate/ circled
February 9, 2018: Senate/ floor amendment # 2
February 9, 2018: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 24
- Absent: 5
January 25, 2018: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor