+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (36)
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- Senate/ to Governor
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling
- Senate/ received from House
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ committee report favorable
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ 3rd reading
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On January 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (5)
March 1, 2017: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 70
- Absent: 5
February 27, 2017: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 3
February 21, 2017: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 26
- Absent: 3
February 17, 2017: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 24
- Absent: 5
January 31, 2017: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor