+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (27)
On March 5, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate/filed
On March 5, 2003 in the House:
- House Sent to Senate
- House / Enacting Clause Struck
On February 13, 2003 in the House:
- House Read 3rd Time
On February 11, 2003 in the House:
- House Read 2nd Time
- House Comm Report Favorable/Amended
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
On January 28, 2003 in the House:
- House Comm - Held
On January 27, 2003 in the House:
- House Sent to Standing Committee
- House Read 1st Time (Introduced)
- House Received from Senate
On January 24, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate/read 3rd
- Senate/pass 3rd
- Senate/floor amendment
- Senate/to House with amendments
On January 23, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate/pass 2nd
- Senate/read 2nd
- Senate/under suspension of the rules
- Senate/committee report favorable
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 21, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate/to Standing Committee
On January 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate/read 1st (Introduced)
On January 17, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate/received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- Senate/received from LRGC
On December 20, 2002 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
On December 18, 2002 in the House:
- Numbered
+ − Amendment
Senate Amendment # 1
Prepared
+ − Votes (2)
January 24, 2003: Senate/pass 3rd
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 3
January 23, 2003: Senate/pass 2nd
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor