+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ filed
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ strike enacting clause
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading/ suspension
- House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ floor amendment
- Senate/ to House
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ comm rpt/ amended
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publically Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendments (3)
Senate Amendment # 2
Prepared
Senate Amendment # 3
Passed
Senate Amendment # 1
Committee Amendments Prepared
+ − Votes (5)
March 11, 2013: Senate/ floor amendment
March 11, 2013: Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 12
- Absent: 1
March 11, 2013: Senate/ uncircled
March 8, 2013: Senate/ circled
February 27, 2013: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor