+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On March 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ filed
- Senate/ strike enacting clause
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Returned to Rules
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On January 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On January 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Vote
February 9, 2021: Senate Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed
- Yeas: 2
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor