+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate/ filed
- Senate/ strike enacting clause
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules
- Senate Comm - Returned to Rules
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Held
On January 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Held
On January 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On January 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Vote
January 30, 2019: Senate Comm - Held
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor