+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (31)
On March 17, 2006 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 10, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
On March 10, 2006 in the House:
- Pass Review Forward for Enrolling
On March 10, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Governor
On February 3, 2006 in the House:
- Enroll Draft
On February 1, 2006 in the House:
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ read 3rd time
- House/ signed by Speaker sent to Senate
On February 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President/ enrolled
- Received from Senate for Enrolling
On January 27, 2006 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ committee report favorable
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 25, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 20, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ pass 3rd
- Senate/ read 3rd
On January 20, 2006 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On January 20, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
On January 20, 2006 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On January 19, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ pass 2nd
- Senate/ read 2nd
On January 18, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On January 17, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 16, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
On January 13, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from Legislative Research
On December 22, 2005 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
On December 15, 2005 in the House:
- Numbered
+ − Votes (5)
February 1, 2006: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 69
- Absent: 6
January 27, 2006: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1
January 20, 2006: Senate/ pass 3rd
- Yeas: 29
January 19, 2006: Senate/ pass 2nd
- Yeas: 28
- Absent: 1
January 17, 2006: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor