+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (44)
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Governor
- Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ concurs with House amendment
- Senate/ to House
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate
- House/ to Senate
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
- Senate/ received from House
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
On February 19, 2021 in the House:
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 2
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House/ comm rpt/ substituted/ amended
- House/ 2nd reading
On February 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ 3rd reading
On February 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd reading
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
House Committee Amendment 1
Passed
+ − Votes (10)
February 25, 2021: Senate/ concurs with House amendment
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
February 24, 2021: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 72
- Absent: 3
February 19, 2021: House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 2
- Yeas: 11
- Absent: 5
February 19, 2021: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 11
- Absent: 5
February 19, 2021: House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1
- Yeas: 11
- Absent: 5
February 9, 2021: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 29
February 8, 2021: Senate/ uncircled
February 8, 2021: Senate/ circled
February 8, 2021: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 26
- Absent: 3
February 1, 2021: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor