+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (46)
On March 11, 2009 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 10, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
On March 10, 2009 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 10, 2009 in the Senate:
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
- Senate/ signed by President sent for enrolling
- Senate/ received from House
On March 10, 2009 in the House:
- House/ signed by Speaker sent to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ read 3rd time
On March 10, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Governor
On March 9, 2009 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On March 9, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ substitute
- Senate/ pass 3rd
- Senate/ to House
On March 9, 2009 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to floor
On March 9, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
On March 9, 2009 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
- House/ under suspension of the rules
- House/ Rules Committee to 3rd Reading Calendar
On March 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ read 3rd
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ motion to reconsider passed
- Senate/ substitute
On March 3, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ pass 2nd
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ read 2nd
On February 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate/ comm report/ amended
On February 17, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Not Considered
On February 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate/ lifted from standing committee
On February 10, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 9, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 6, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from Legislative Research
On February 5, 2009 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (4)
March 10, 2009: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 18
- Absent: 4
March 9, 2009: Senate/ pass 3rd
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
March 3, 2009: Senate/ pass 2nd
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 12
- Absent: 1
February 19, 2009: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor