+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (53)
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing
- Senate/ to Governor
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On March 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- House/ circled
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- House/ uncircled
- House/ substituted from # 0 to # 3
- House/ passed 3rd reading
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
- Senate/ concurs with House amendment
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate
- House/ to Senate
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ circled
- House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- House/ comm rpt/ amended
- House/ 2nd reading
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- House Comm - Held
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- House Comm - Not Considered
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 3rd reading
- Senate/ floor amendment # 1
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ to House
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd reading
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ committee report favorable
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
On January 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (11)
March 10, 2016: House/ circled
March 10, 2016: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 50
- Nays: 23
- Absent: 2
March 10, 2016: House/ substituted from # 0 to # 3
March 10, 2016: House/ uncircled
March 10, 2016: Senate/ concurs with House amendment
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 1
March 3, 2016: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 6
February 16, 2016: House Comm - Held
- Yeas: 10
- Absent: 4
February 4, 2016: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 5
February 4, 2016: Senate/ floor amendment # 1
February 3, 2016: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 6
- Absent: 1
January 29, 2016: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor