+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On March 11, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ strike enacting clause
On March 3, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules
- Senate Comm - Returned to Rules
On February 9, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
- Senate Comm - Held
On February 8, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 8, 2010 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 5, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Not Considered
On February 4, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 3, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
On February 2, 2010 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Vote
February 9, 2010: Senate Comm - Held
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Sen. Buttars, D. C.
Type:
Primary Sponsor