+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ filed
On March 1, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ enacting clause struck
On February 6, 2006 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On February 3, 2006 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On February 3, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House with amendments
- Senate/ pass 3rd
- Senate/ floor amendment
- Senate/ read 3rd
On February 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ pass 2nd
- Senate/ read 2nd
On January 30, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On January 27, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 25, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
- Senate/ to standing committee
On January 24, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
On January 23, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from Legislative Research
On January 20, 2006 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
+ − Votes (3)
February 3, 2006: Senate/ pass 3rd
- Yeas: 24
- Absent: 5
February 1, 2006: Senate/ pass 2nd
- Yeas: 25
- Absent: 4
January 27, 2006: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor