+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (36)
On March 16, 2005 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 9, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Governor
On March 8, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
On March 8, 2005 in the House:
- Pass Review Forward for Enrolling
On February 21, 2005 in the House:
- Enroll Draft
On February 18, 2005 in the Senate:
- Received from Senate for Enrolling
On February 17, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate/ concurs with House amendments
On February 17, 2005 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker sent to Senate
On February 17, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President/ enrolled
On February 16, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
- Senate/ received from House
On February 16, 2005 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ read 3rd time
On February 11, 2005 in the House:
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House/ comm report favorable/ amended
- House/ read 2nd time
On February 8, 2005 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On February 7, 2005 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On February 7, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ pass 3rd
- Senate/ read 3rd
On February 4, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 2nd
- Senate/ pass 2nd
On January 28, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On January 27, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 26, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 21, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On January 20, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from Legislative Research
On January 19, 2005 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
+ − Votes (6)
February 17, 2005: Senate/ concurs with House amendments
- Yeas: 28
- Absent: 1
February 16, 2005: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 70
- Absent: 5
February 11, 2005: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 2
February 7, 2005: Senate/ pass 3rd
- Yeas: 28
- Absent: 1
February 4, 2005: Senate/ pass 2nd
- Yeas: 21
- Absent: 8
January 27, 2005: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 2
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor