+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (46)
On March 25, 2011 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing
- Senate/ to Governor
On March 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
On March 17, 2011 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 15, 2011 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 10, 2011 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On March 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
- Senate/ concurs with House amendment
- Senate/ to House
On March 10, 2011 in the House:
- House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate
- House/ to Senate
On March 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
On March 9, 2011 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ floor amendment
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ 2nd reading/ suspension
- House/ lifted from Rules
On March 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ 3rd reading
On March 1, 2011 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On March 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
On March 1, 2011 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On February 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On February 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ committee report favorable
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 22, 2011 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On February 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
- Senate/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On February 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
On February 17, 2011 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
On February 5, 2011 in the House:
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
On February 4, 2011 in the House:
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
+ − Amendment
House Amendment # 1
Passed
+ − Votes (5)
March 10, 2011: Senate/ concurs with House amendment
- Yeas: 28
- Absent: 1
March 9, 2011: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 59
- Nays: 8
- Absent: 8
March 1, 2011: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 26
- Absent: 3
February 28, 2011: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 24
- Absent: 5
February 24, 2011: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 3
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor