+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ filed
- Senate/ failed
- Senate/ uncircled
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ floor amendment
- Senate/ uncircled
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ substituted
- Senate/ uncircled
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ committee report favorable
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Publically Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
Senate Amendment # 1
Passed
+ − Votes (5)
March 5, 2013: Senate/ circled
March 5, 2013: Senate/ failed
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 18
March 5, 2013: Senate/ floor amendment
March 5, 2013: Senate/ uncircled
February 15, 2013: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor